WA HJR4200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the state Constitution to provide governmental continuity during emergency periods resulting from a catastrophic incident.
Title
Amending the state Constitution to provide governmental continuity during emergency periods resulting from a catastrophic incident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-22 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR8200 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=4200&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Resolutions/4200.pdf |