WA SB5014 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exemption of the special commitment center under the public records act. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning exempting special commitment center and private detention facility security information from public disclosure. )
Title
Concerning the exemption of the special commitment center under the public records act. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning exempting special commitment center and private detention facility security information from public disclosure. )
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Floor amendment | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1030 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-13 - Effective date 7/26/2006.