WA SB5024 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making conforming amendments made necessary by reorganizing and streamlining central service functions, powers, and duties of state government.
Title
Making conforming amendments made necessary by reorganizing and streamlining central service functions, powers, and duties of state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 225, 2015 Laws PV. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-31 | House | GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | GOSS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security. |
2014-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1055 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.