WA SB5036 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the authority and procedures for unit priced contracting by public utility districts.
Title
Clarifying the authority and procedures for unit priced contracting by public utility districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 85, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-03 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:30 AM. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2017-03-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |