WA SB5058 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a pilot vessel amnesty disposal program.
Title
Creating a pilot vessel amnesty disposal program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Revert to Rules White Sheet. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-01-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-30 | NROR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |