WA SB5063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing prepaid postage for all election ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing prepaid postage for all election ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateEffective date 7/1/2019.
2019-04-29SenateChapter 161, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-29SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-18SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-12HouseHeld on second reading.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-23SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-23SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-12-31SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1209 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-25 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5063&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5063.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5063-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5063-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5063-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117088&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5063&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117088&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5063&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117088&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5063&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback