WA SB5067 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning potential impeachment disclosures.
Title
Concerning potential impeachment disclosures.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5067&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5067.pdf |