WA SB5068 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the term essential academic learning requirements to state learning standards to reflect current terminology.
Title
Updating the term essential academic learning requirements to state learning standards to reflect current terminology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1120 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5068&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5068.pdf |