WA SB5096 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring mailed political advertising to be filed with the secretary of state to be archived.
Title
Requiring mailed political advertising to be filed with the secretary of state to be archived.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Revert to Rules White Sheet. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-02 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5096&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5096.pdf |