WA SB5113 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning community and technical colleges granting high school diplomas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning community and technical colleges granting high school diplomas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-29SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2019-01-10SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1714 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback