WA SB5129 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Planning for advanced nuclear reactor technology in Washington.
Title
Planning for advanced nuclear reactor technology in Washington.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. James McCune [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |