WA SB5141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the recommendations of the environmental justice task force.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the environmental justice task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Chapter 314, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-10 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
ECOLOGY, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENT
ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH AND SAFETY
GOVERNOR
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
INDIANS
MINORITIES
NATURAL RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT
PUGET SOUND PARTNERSHIP
TRANSPORTATION, DEPARTMENT
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
ECOLOGY, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENT
ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH AND SAFETY
GOVERNOR
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
INDIANS
MINORITIES
NATURAL RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT
PUGET SOUND PARTNERSHIP
TRANSPORTATION, DEPARTMENT
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
90 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |