WA SB5163 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Effective date 4/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the sunset provisions on the medicaid fraud false claims act.
Title
Removing the sunset provisions on the medicaid fraud false claims act.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Effective date 4/14/2023. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 90, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-24 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-01 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 131 | 419 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 131 | 420 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |