WA SB5205 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing spouses to combine volunteer hours for purposes of receiving a complimentary discover pass.
Title
Allowing spouses to combine volunteer hours for purposes of receiving a complimentary discover pass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 2:00 PM. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |