WA SB5225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the contracting procedures for cities.
Title
Clarifying the contracting procedures for cities.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1174 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5225&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5225.pdf |