WA SB5267 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.
Title
Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Workplace Standards (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-28 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1548 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | New Code | See Bill Text |