WA SB5271 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding abandoned or derelict vessels.
Title
Regarding abandoned or derelict vessels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Chapter 247, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-03 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-08 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-08 | NRMW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Marine Waters at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-19 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1322 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.