WA SB5271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Aligning existing definitions and practices to establish a uniform process for updating addresses of record and make conforming amendments to statutes administered by the department of licensing.
Title
Aligning existing definitions and practices to establish a uniform process for updating addresses of record and make conforming amendments to statutes administered by the department of licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1813 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.