WA SB5290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/1/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating the use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating the use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/1/2019*.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 312, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-28SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-27HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-27HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-27HouseRules suspended.
2019-04-27HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2019-04-27SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-26HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
2019-04-26SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 52; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-03HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-12Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-29SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1434 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5290&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5290.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5290-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5290-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5290-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5290-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5290-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117755&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5290&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117755&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5290&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117755&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5290&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117755&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5290&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback