WA SB5327 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Effective date 4/16/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-16 - Effective date 4/16/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical corrections to election provisions.
Title
Making technical corrections to election provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | Effective date 4/16/2009. | |
2009-04-16 | Chapter 107, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-16 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-09 | President signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-03-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-03-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-07 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-16 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1364 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.