WA SB5327 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the requirement to obtain a certificate of academic achievement or certificate of individual achievement to graduate from high school.
Title
Eliminating the requirement to obtain a certificate of academic achievement or certificate of individual achievement to graduate from high school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1363 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5327&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5327.pdf |