WA SB5343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating high school success.
Title
Facilitating high school success.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |