WA SB5350 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the purchase of an optional life annuity benefit for certain public retirement system members.
Title
Concerning the purchase of an optional life annuity benefit for certain public retirement system members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2020. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 189, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1413 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.