WA SB5375 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making the public art capital budget language permanent for efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making the public art capital budget language permanent for efficiency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget.
2019-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-04SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB1318 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback