WA SB5379 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing services and supports to parenting minors to improve educational attainment.
Title
Providing services and supports to parenting minors to improve educational attainment.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:05 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1327 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.