WA SB5386 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an organ donation work group.
Title
Creating an organ donation work group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-18 | Chapter 104, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-18 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-06 | President signed. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-21 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-14 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-11 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |