WA SB5394 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of child abduction statutes to residential provisions ordered by a court.
Title
Clarifying the applicability of child abduction statutes to residential provisions ordered by a court.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1302 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Effective date 7/24/2015.