WA SB5412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with transportation fuels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the greenhouse gas emissions associated with transportation fuels.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB1110 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback