WA SB5420 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Title
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1008 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-25 - Effective date 1/1/2024.