WA SB5441 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating incentives for the use of biomass in renewable energy production.
Title
Creating incentives for the use of biomass in renewable energy production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-16 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-16 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1610 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.