WA SB5468 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of tourist for the purposes of the lodging tax.
Title
Modifying the definition of tourist for the purposes of the lodging tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5468&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5468.pdf |