WA SB5468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning device registration, civil penalties, and service agent registration for the weights and measures program.
Title
Concerning device registration, civil penalties, and service agent registration for the weights and measures program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1298 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5468&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5468.pdf |