WA SB5503 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for uniform clinical placement hours for nursing education programs.
Title
Establishing requirements for uniform clinical placement hours for nursing education programs.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |