WA SB5526 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the availability of quality, affordable health coverage in the individual market.
Title
Increasing the availability of quality, affordable health coverage in the individual market.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 364, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2019-04-27 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 2:10 PM 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report; received 1:37 PM 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Cody, Macri, Schmick. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Cleveland, Frockt, O'Ban. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1523 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.