WA SB5562 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning providers and facilities' participation in the provision of medical care or in the withholding or withdrawal of life-sustaining treatment in accordance with a form developed by the department of health.
Title
Concerning providers and facilities' participation in the provision of medical care or in the withholding or withdrawal of life-sustaining treatment in accordance with a form developed by the department of health.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Nathan Schlicher [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |