WA SB5579 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the volatility of crude oil received in the state by rail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the volatility of crude oil received in the state by rail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 354, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 5.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-07SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB1785 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-30 - First reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5579&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5579.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5579-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5579-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5579-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5579-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118463&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5579&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118463&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5579&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118463&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5579&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback