WA SB5591 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting previously registered vehicles from the stolen vehicle check fee.
Title
Exempting previously registered vehicles from the stolen vehicle check fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 239, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-24 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-01-24 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |