WA SB5633 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting agricultural fair premiums from the unclaimed property act.
Title
Exempting agricultural fair premiums from the unclaimed property act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-18 | Chapter 116, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-18 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-12 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-06 | President signed. | |
2011-04-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-22 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-22 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | ARED - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-02 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1757 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.