WA SB5658 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective date 7/22/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale or exchange of surplus real property by the department of transportation.
Title
Concerning the sale or exchange of surplus real property by the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective date 7/22/2011*. | |
2011-05-16 | Chapter 376, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-16 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-21 | President signed. | |
2011-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Floor amendment | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-24 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-22 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |