WA SB5734 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the hospital safety net assessment.
Title
Concerning the hospital safety net assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2019. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 318, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1748 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.