WA SB5755 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying the population growth criteria for planning required by the growth management act.
Title
Simplifying the population growth criteria for planning required by the growth management act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Local Government. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1101 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.