WA SB5858 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the just and equitable distribution of real property and liabilities in the dissolution of marriage or domestic partnerships.
Title
Concerning the just and equitable distribution of real property and liabilities in the dissolution of marriage or domestic partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |