WA SB5971 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington publicly owned trust in order to create a financing infrastructure to implement Initiative Measure No. 502 that complies with the United States attorney general's guidance letter of August 29, 2013, thereby providing resources for public infrastructure and other public purposes.
Title
Establishing the Washington publicly owned trust in order to create a financing infrastructure to implement Initiative Measure No. 502 that complies with the United States attorney general's guidance letter of August 29, 2013, thereby providing resources for public infrastructure and other public purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. David Frockt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5971&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5971.pdf |