WA SB6008 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying water-sewer district provisions.
Title
Modifying water-sewer district provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2413 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-16 - First reading, referred to Local Government