WA SB6018 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating early learning coordinators at educational service districts.
Title
Designating early learning coordinators at educational service districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Nikki Torres [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |