WA SB6062 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning direct primary care oversight.
Title
Concerning direct primary care oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |