WA SB6147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the replacement of shoreline armoring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the replacement of shoreline armoring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-28HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2020-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-23SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback