WA SB6152 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning certification of the level of foreign national ownership for corporations that participate in Washington state elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning certification of the level of foreign national ownership for corporations that participate in Washington state elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-25SenateChapter 152, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-25SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-10SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-03-10SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-10HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
2020-03-09SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-16HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2020-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-30SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-29SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-29SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6152&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6152.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6152-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6152-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6152-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120879&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6152&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120879&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6152&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=120879&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6152&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback