WA SB6156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the requirements for collector vehicle registrations.
Title
Modifying the requirements for collector vehicle registrations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2373 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.