WA SB6206 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning telecommunications installations.
Title
Concerning telecommunications installations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | LWD - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2253 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.